Hurlbut v. Arkansas Attorney General et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Hurlbut
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Keith Waddle, Wendy Kelley, Thomas Burns, Stieve, University of Arkansas Medical Sciences, Hardy, Shelly Byers, Roger Tims, WellPath, Correct Care Solutions, Brent Eubanks, Shurika Brown, Maurice Culclager, Amplo, Rory Griffin, Gary Musselwhite, G Holland, Arkansas Attorney General, Vincent P France and Does UAMS Endocrinology Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00037
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #8 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing, with prejudice, Mr. Hurlbut's claims that Defendants failed to process his grievances; dismissing, without prejudice, his access-to-courts claims, due process claims, conspiracy claims, and retaliation claims; dismissing, with prejudice, his claims against Defendant Eubanks; dismissing, without prejudice, claims against CCS, and Wellpath; and instructing the Clerk to terminate the Arkansas Attorney General, Vincent P. France, Brent Eubanks, Thomas Burns, Correct Care Solutions, WellPath, Shelly Byers, Wendy Kelly, Dexter Payne, Rory Griffin, Gary Musselwhite, G. Holland, Shurika Brown, Maurice Culclager, Hardy, Amplo, Roger Tims, and Keith Waddle as Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/2/2019. (ljb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #10 Objections filed by Daniel Hurlbut. (llg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #8 Partial Recommended Disposition by Daniel Hurlbut. (llg)
June 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Stieve and forward to the U.S. Marshal. (jbh)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare a summons for Defendant Stieve; directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the #2 complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for Defendant Stieve without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security; and directing the Clerk to terminate UAMS as a party Defendant and to add Doe Defendants, UAMS Endocrinology Department, as Defendants. Mr. Hurlbut has 90 days from the date this lawsuit was filed to identify and serve the UAMS employees who allegedly failed to provide him constitutionally adequate medical care. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/19/2019. (jbh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Hurlbut's claims that Defendants failed to process his grievances be dismissed, with prejudice; that his access-to-courts claims, due process claims, conspiracy claims, and retaliation claims be dismissed, without prejudice; that his claims against Defendant Eubanks be dismissed, with prejudice; and that claims against CCS and WellPath be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/19/2019. (csf)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #6 Order by Daniel Hurlbut. (ljb)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Court agrees with the opinions of United States Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. If Plaintiff declines to file an amended complaint, Judge Deere will evaluate his complaint as written and as stated in her #4 Order, the "failure to file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of some or all of his claims." Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/22/2019. (ljb)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 APPEAL of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #4 Order and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel Hurlbut. (llg)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Mr. Hurlbut has 30 days to file an Amended Complaint providing further explanation on retaliation claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/10/2019. (csf)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Grimes Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/9/2019. (ljb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Daniel Hurlbut. (ljb)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Hurlbut. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurlbut v. Arkansas Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stieve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arkansas Medical Sciences
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shurika Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Culclager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amplo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Musselwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent P France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does UAMS Endocrinology Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hurlbut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?