Johnson v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Johnson, Jr
Defendant: S Armstrong, Wendy Kelley, Billy Cowell, Toni Bradley, Rory Griffin, Aric Simmions, Asa Hutchinson and John Felts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00038
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Copies and Notice of Change of Address by Robert Lee Johnson, Jr. (ljb)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot #5 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk of Court to change Johnson's address to the Randall Williams Unit; allowing another opportunity for Johnson to amend his complaint to fully describe his claims; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Johnson a blank 1983 form. In the event Johnson fails to file an amended complaint conforming to this order within 30 days, the case may be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/2/2019. (ljb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Lee Johnson, Jr. (kdr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Robert Lee Johnson, Jr.(kdr)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting #1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Pine Bluff Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office; directing Johnson to file a signed amended complaint within thirty days; and directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 5/13/2019. (jbh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Lee Johnson, Jr. (llg)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Lee Johnson, Jr. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Cowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric Simmions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?