Wilson v. Hall et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilson
Defendant: Marjorie Hall, Tracey L Franklin, Thompson, Johnson, Amie Burrow, Terry Fulfer and Cooper
Case Number: 1:2019cv00062
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATION recommending that #23 Wilson's motion for temporary restraining order should be denied. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/10/2019. (ljb)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #24 motion to add Sergeant Ross as a defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/10/2019. (ljb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. Discovery requests and responses are not to be filed with the Court - but, instead, should be sent directly to opposing counsel, along with a certificate of service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) (providing that the following discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing: (i) depositions, (ii) interrogatories, (iii) requests for documents or to permit entry upon the land, and (iv) requests for admissions); See also Local Rule 5.5(c)(2)(stating that [a]ny party proceeding pro se shall be expected to be familiar with and follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). In contrast, motions to compel and/or for sanctions, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, and any necessary attachments will be accepted for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/9/2019. (cfd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to add Defendant by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Thomas Wilson.(kdr)
August 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to Amie Burrow, Cooper, Terry Fulfer, Marjorie Hall, Johnson, Thompson and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 motion to dismiss defendant; instructing the Clerk of Court to terminate Franklin as a defendant in the style of this case; granting #19 motion to add defendants; denying without prejudice #20 motion to subpoena video footage; and directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for defendants and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #17 amended complaint and summons on each defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/28/2019. (ljb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Subpoena Video Footage by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. Wilson's amended complaint is due 30 days from the date of this Order. Wilson does not need discovery or law library research to better explain his claims as explained in the Court's August 5, 2019 Order (Doc. No. #5 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/16/2019. (cfd)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #12 Motion for Order to Proceed with Original Complaint. Wilson must amend his complaint as directed by the Court in its August 5, 2019 Order (Doc. No. #5 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/16/2019. (cfd)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/16/2019. (cfd)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Proceed with Original Complaint by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Order. The defendants in this case have not been served. Plaintiff has not yet filed an amended complaint. See Doc. No. #5 . Once defendants are served (If service is deemed appropriate), discovery requests and responses are not to be filed with the Court but, instead, should be sent directly to opposing counsel, along with a certificate of service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) (providing that the following discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing: (i) depositions, (ii) interrogatories, (iii) requests for documents or to permit entry upon the land, and (iv) requests for admissions); See also Local Rule 5.5(c)(2)(stating that [a]ny party proceeding pro se shall be expected to be familiar with and follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). In contrast, motions to compel and/or for sanctions, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, and any necessary attachments will be accepted for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/15/2019. (cfd)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Discovery. The defendants in this case have not been served. Plaintiff has not yet filed an amended complaint. See Doc. No. #5 . Once defendants are served (If service is deemed appropriate), discovery requests and responses are not to be filed with the Court but, instead, should be sent directly to opposing counsel, along with a certificate of service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) (providing that the following discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing: (i) depositions, (ii) interrogatories, (iii) requests for documents or to permit entry upon the land, and (iv) requests for admissions); See also Local Rule 5.5(c)(2)(stating that [a]ny party proceeding pro se shall be expected to be familiar with and follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). In contrast, motions to compel and/or for sanctions, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, and any necessary attachments will be accepted for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/15/2019. (cfd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Thomas Wilson. (llg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Subpoena by Thomas Wilson. (llg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery by Thomas Wilson. (llg)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing Wilson to file an amended complaint no later than 30 days after this order's entry date; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Wilson a blank 1983 form and a copy of this order to the Warden of the North Central Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralization Bank Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/5/2019. (ljb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Wilson. (kdr)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS denying without prejudice #1 IFP application; directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; and directing Wilson to return a completed IFP application or pay the $400 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 7/22/2019. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Wilson. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey L Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amie Burrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Fulfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?