Woodham v. Counts et al
Plaintiff: Trevor Lynn Woodham
Defendant: David Huffmaster, Mark Counts and John Huffmaster
Case Number: 1:2019cv00067
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (kdr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/18/2019. (kdr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #5 Trevor Lynn Woodham's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing without prejudice #6 amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/17/2019. (kdr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trevor Lynn Woodham.(kdr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevor Lynn Woodham. (kdr)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Woodham to supplement his complaint as explained within 30 days of the date of this order. The clerk is directed to forward Woodham a blank 42 U.S.C. section 1983 complaint form together with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/14/2019. (jbh)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Administrator of the Sharp County Detention Center. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/9/2019. (jbh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Trevor Lynn Woodham.(kdr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Trevor Lynn Woodham. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodham v. Counts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Huffmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huffmaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Lynn Woodham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?