Baxter et al v. Independence County et al
Plaintiff: Susan Baxter and Tye Baxter
Defendant: Sissy Wilson, Shawn Stephens and Independence County
Case Number: 1:2019cv00069
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Deficiency Letter filed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. (Gillham, Lucien)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #15 Reply to Response to Motion lacks a correct case number (Local Rule 5.5(a)). (jak)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Gillham, Lucien)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson. (Jones, Jamie Marie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Response to Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Gillham, Lucien)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Ashley on behalf of All Defendants (Ashley, Joshua)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count II)" as marked on the document. (jak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count II) filed by Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson. (Jones, Jamie Marie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Count II) by Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson (Jones, Jamie Marie)(Docket text modified on 9/18/2019 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Allen Wood on behalf of Shawn Stephens (Wood, Russell)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Independence County, Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson.(Jones, Jamie Marie)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Marie Huffman Jones on behalf of Independence County, Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson (Jones, Jamie Marie)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. (Gillham, Lucien)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. Sissy Wilson served on 8/12/2019. (Gillham, Lucien)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. (Gillham, Lucien)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. Shawn Stephens served on 8/12/2019. (Gillham, Lucien)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. Independence County served on 8/12/2019. (Gillham, Lucien)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Susan Baxter, Tye Baxter. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073391.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter et al v. Independence County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sissy Wilson
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Stephens
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Russell Allen Wood
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence County
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Baxter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tye Baxter
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?