Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC v. J & D Farms Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC
Defendant: J & D Farms Partnership, Huey & Norris I Farms LLC, Brian Norris, Joey Don Huey, Huey Farms Partnership, Debbie Huey, Bobby Huey, Jamie Huey and Bryan Norris
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and on the grounds of forum non conveniens filed by All Defendants. (Chunn, Alexandra)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND ON THE GROUNDS OF FORUM NON CONVENIENS by All Defendants (Chunn, Alexandra)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that #11 motion to dismiss the original complaint is denied as moot at this time, without prejudice to refiling if Defendants deem it necessary in light of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/7/2019. (ljb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra T. Chunn on behalf of All Defendants (Chunn, Alexandra)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. (Scott, Ralph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scott, Ralph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC (Scott, Ralph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Stroud, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants (Stroud, Robert)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Stroud on behalf of All Defendants (Stroud, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judgment and Complaint , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Brian Norris served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Joey Don Huey served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Notice, consent and Reference of a Magistrate Judge; Complaint; Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Jamie Huey served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action To a Magistrate Judge; Complaint; Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. J & D Farms Partnership served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Notice, Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge; Complaint; Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Huey & Norris I Farms LLC served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action ot a Magistrate Judgment; Complaint, Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Huey Farms Partnership served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons; Notice, Consent, and Referance of a Civil Action To a Magistrate Judge; Complaint; Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Debbie Huey served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge, Complaint, Exhibits , filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Bobby Huey served on 8/27/2019. (Rowe, Roger)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT073541.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC v. J & D Farms Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & D Farms Partnership
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huey & Norris I Farms LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Norris
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Don Huey
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huey Farms Partnership
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Huey
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Huey
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Huey
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Norris
Represented By: Robert D. Stroud
Represented By: Alexandra T. Chunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Ralph D. Scott, III
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?