First Community Bank v. Evans et al
Plaintiff: First Community Bank
Defendant: Barry Sellers and Rhonda Sellers
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Kerry W Evans and N-Sta-Smile Inc
3Rd Party Defendant: Small Business Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00074
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Replies due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/16/2019. (rmg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #8 Memorandum by Kerry W Evans, N-Sta-Smile Inc (Hargis, Joel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/17/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/30/2019; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 8/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Batesville Courtroom # 252 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/09/2019. (rmg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McCord, Stacey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Small Business Administration(U.S. ) (McCord, Stacey)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Third Party Complaint. Answer due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 08/30/2019. (rmg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Third Party Complaint by Small Business Administration(U.S. ) (McCord, Stacey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Small Business Administration, filed by N-Sta-Smile Inc and Kerry W Evans.(kdr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Kerry W Evans, N-Sta-Smile Inc, Barry Sellers and Rhonda Sellers.(kdr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by First Community Bank.(kdr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Small Business Administration from Sharp County Circuit Court, case number CV-2015-140. Filing Fee waived. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Community Bank v. Evans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Kerry W Evans
Represented By: Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: N-Sta-Smile Inc
Represented By: Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Community Bank
Represented By: Laura Wood Brissey
Represented By: Christine Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Sellers
Represented By: Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Sellers
Represented By: Ronald Schroeder Burnett, Jr.
Represented By: Joel G. Hargis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?