Garrett v. Green et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Wayne Garrett
Defendant: Lance Bonds and Kirk Green
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #7 Order that was entered on this day, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/28/2019. (ljb)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving and adopting in its entirety #6 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing, without prejudice, Mr. Garrett's claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/28/2019. (ljb)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Mr. Garrett's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's #5 Order and his failure to prosecute this lawsuit. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/8/2019. (csf)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/6/2019. (kdr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00250. Electronic file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 9/3/2019. (mem) [Transferred from iasd on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyler Wayne Garrett. (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 9/5/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lance Bonds, Kirk Green, filed by Tyler Wayne Garrett. (kjw) [Transferred from iasd on 9/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Green et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Wayne Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?