Murphy v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Defendant: Toni Bradley, Laryea, Linda Lewis, Hutchinson, Payne, Hughes, Rorey Griffen, Charlotte Gardner, Johnny Swift, Banard Williams, Payte, John Hearington, Steive, Biaza, Kizer, Elisabeth Baker and Fields
Case Number: 1:2019cv00105
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Steive served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Hughes served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Hutchinson served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Charlotte Gardner served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Biaza served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Banard Williams served on 12/12/2019. (ajt)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting #9 proposed findings and recommendations; and dismissing Defendants Bradley, Hearington, Payne, Griffin, Laryea, Payte, Lewis, and Swift for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/13/2019. (ajt)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/09/2019. (lmc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #9 Partial Report and Recommendations by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/2019.(gmh)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #9 Report and Recommendations by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (kdr)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (kdr)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date as 11/20/2019 as marked on the document. (jak)
November 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Biaza, Charlotte Gardner, Hughes, Hutchinson, Steive, Banard Williams. And forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Dr. Steive, Dr. Hughes, APN Hutchinson, Bernard Williams, Biaza, and Charlotte Gardner; directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #6 Amended Complaint and #7 #8 Addenda and summons on Defendants, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office and the Warden of the McPherson Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/20/2019. (ajt)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 and #6 Defendants Bradley, Hearington, Payne, Griffen, Laryea, Payte, Lewis, and Swift be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted.Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/20/2019. (lmc) (Docket text modified on 11/21/2019 to correct the signature date)(jak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #4 Order by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 ADDENDUM to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (Docketed pursuant to Order entered in 1:19-cv-112 BSM, DE No. 2.)(kdr)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (llg)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER holding in abeyance #1 ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to mail a 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff with this Order; directing Plaintiff to amend her Complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order; and denying without prejudice as premature #3 Plaintiff's Motion to appoint counsel. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/30/2019. (kdr)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Ryan Murphy. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laryea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rorey Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hearington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ryan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?