Warren v. Bradley
Plaintiff: Katherine R Warren
Defendant: Bradley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00117
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Katherine R Warren be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to comply with #2 Order. Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/22/2020. (csf)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER advising Petitioner Katherine Warren to file a request to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days of this order; directing the Clerk to send Ms. Warren an application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order; advising Ms. Warren to file an amended petition within 30 days; and advising Ms. Warren that the state-court appeal process is separate from the process to file a federal petition for writ of habeas corpus in this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/03/2019. (ajt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Katherine R Warren. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine R Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?