Nelson v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc, et al

Case Number: 2:2004cv00171
Filed: September 22, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 265 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 264 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/22/11. (kpr)
August 12, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 216 MOTION to Approve/Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Daryal T Nelson: Class counsel are hereby awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of one-third of the Settlement Fund, and $405,213.16 in reimbursement of expenses. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/12/09. (bkp)
July 30, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Amended General Order 54 granting 235 Motion to Allow Electronic Devices to be brought into the Courthouse by Morgan "Chip" Welch, Hank Bates, John W. Walker, Ashley Welch Hudson, Jeanne Gray and Joy Springer for a Hearing on Thursday, July 30, 2009 before Judge Wilson, subject to the rules set out in this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/30/09. (mkf)
July 16, 2009 232 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel directing them to submit expected witnessses for an evidentiary hearing by 5 p.m. Monday, July 20, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/16/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER OF APPROVAL AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/8/09. Associated Cases: 2:04-cv-00171-WRW, 2:05-cv-00134-WRW(bkp)
June 30, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 222 Motion for Issuance of Amended General Order No. 54; persons identified who will be permitted to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse for a Hearing on June 30, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/30/09. (mkf)
June 17, 2009 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 208 "Motion to Joint-In and 'Objection,'" and directing plaintiffs' counsel to forward Mr. Moore's request to the Claims Administrator. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/17/09. (bkp)
February 24, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re General Order 54 authorizing certain electronics into the courtroom. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/24/09. (bkp)
January 27, 2009 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 151 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/27/09. (mkf)
January 13, 2009 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Class Claims. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/09. (mkf)
September 24, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Motion to Quash the deposition of H. Lee Scott, jr.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/24/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?