Gonzalez v. Sanders

Case Number: 2:2005cv00269
Filed: October 28, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 197 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 196 Memorandum and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered awarding Jose Luis Gonzalez $813,000 in compensatory damages on his Federal Tort Claims Act claim; pltf's motion for attorney's fees and costs 192 is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/15/10. (vjt)
September 14, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf 14 days from the entry of this Order to file a formal motion for attorney's fees and costs as directed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/14/10. (vjt)
August 31, 2010 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf until 9/14/10 to submit a post-trial brief on attorney's fees and costs; the government's response is due 9/28/10; no extensions on these deadlines will be granted. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/31/10. (vjt)
August 20, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 175 Motion for an Order declaring the efficacy of the subpoenas issued in this case. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/20/10. (vjt)
August 16, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot deft Prince's 168 Motion to Quash Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/16/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?