Suggs v. Mobley et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv00281
Filed: November 8, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 156 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/19/09. (mkf)
February 6, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER cancelling trial scheduled for the week of February 9, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/6/09. (bkp)
January 5, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 145 Partial Report and Recommendations, granting [130, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Max Mobley and dismissing plaintiff's claims against him with prejudice; and granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion for Summa ry Judgment filed by Beatrice Boyd, Lynn Lewis, Dottie Yarbrough, Brenda Bearden, Shirley Crawford and dismissing claims against defts Lewis, Boyd and Bearden, with plaintiff's case against defts Yarbrough and Crawford to proceed. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suggs v. Mobley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?