Simes et al v. James et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00091
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT consistent with 141 Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' 109 and 115 Motions for Summary Judgment are granted. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice. The parties are to bear their own fees and costs. The parties have thirty days from entry of this judgment on the docket in which to appeal. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 2/25/2014. (jak)
August 11, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Lawrence W. Jackson is hereby substituted as counsel of record for the Helena-West Helena School District in place of Kent J. Rubens; Attorney Kent J. Rubens terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/11/11. (vjt)
July 31, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY DISMISSING CASE without prejudice to the right of the parties to reopen the proceedings for good cause shown upon resolution of the state criminal actions. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/31/09. (mkf)
June 8, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiffs to file a status report on, or before, June 30, 2009, informing the Court when they will no longer be under threat of prosecution for pending criminal charges and when plaintiffs anticipate they will be able to proceed with their case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simes et al v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?