Jackson v. Speed et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00092
Filed: March 31, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2010 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Central Office of the Arkansas Department of Corrections to ensure the attendance of Daniel K. Strickland at the jury trial scheduled for 8:30 a.m. on Tuesday, January 19, 2010, and each day thereafter until the trial is concluded. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/14/10. (bkp)
July 24, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing named personnel of the Alexander Law Firm to bring electronics into the courthouse in Little Rock, Arkansas, between July 27, 2009, and July 29, 2009. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/24/09. (mkf)
October 3, 2008 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER concluding that the 178 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition should be, and hereby are, approved and adopted in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying as moot 152 Motion for Summary Judgment o f separate Correctional Medical Services Defendants; dismissing Defendant Hickey and the John Doe Defendants; granting in part and denying in part 146 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing, with prejudice, Plaintiff's claims that he was denied a bed mat or water. Arkansas Department of Correction Defendants Barns, Decorsey, Avant, Maney, Golatt, Brooks, and Williams, as well as separate Defendants Speed and Ivey, are entitled to sovereign immunity as to tthe official capacity claims against them but are not entitled to qualified immunity. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/02/08. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Speed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?