Harry Stephens Farms Inc et al v. Wormald Americas Inc et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00166
Filed: July 20, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing deft Helena Chemical Company pursuant to plaintiffs' and deft's stipulation of dismissal, with prejudice to refiling. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/20/10. (bkp)
October 15, 2010 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against Exxon Mobil Corporation with prejudice. Exxon Mobil Corporation terminated. Attorneys Joseph W. Ghormley; Dean T. Howell; Howard E. Jarvis; Steven W. Quattlebaum; Michael Norris Shannon; William J. Stack; John Keeling Baker and Brandon B. Cate terminated.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/15/10. (bkp)
September 27, 2010 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying all pending motions as moot and removing the trial scheduled to begin October 15, 2010 from the court's docket pursuant to having been advised that the parties have reached a settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/27/10. (bkp)
September 16, 2010 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 334 335 346 Motions to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/16/10. (bkp)
September 14, 2010 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 274 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 282 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/14/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 172 Motion to deem requests for admissions admitted and directing the parties to confer and the plaintiffs are directed to provide amended responses to the requests on or before August 2, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/10. (bkp)
July 12, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 191 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 221 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing, with prejudice deft Tyco Fire Products, LP, formerly known as Wormald Americas, Inc.k, Wormald U.S., Inc. and Ansul, Inc.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/12/10. (bkp)
June 29, 2010 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 182 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denying Exxon Mobil's 207 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint and 209 Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines; the deadline for Defts to identify their expert witnesses is extended to 7/15/10; the deadline for depositions of expert witnesses identified by all parties will remain 8/2/10. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
May 26, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 185 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/10. (bkp)
May 4, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Helena Chemical Company's 168 MOTION to Sustain Objections or, in the alternative, for Protective Order is hereby GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/4/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harry Stephens Farms Inc et al v. Wormald Americas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?