Herndon v. Flowers et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv00180
Filed: August 18, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: George Howard
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/1/2012. (dmn)
May 26, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER substituting party Edward R. Turnbull for Cleve E. Johnson, M.D., et al, Trustees re 74 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/26/10. (bkp)
June 26, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Strike ; denying 48 Motion to Dismiss; granting 49 Motion for Joinder; granting 53 Motion to Continue; the Court will issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herndon v. Flowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?