Helena Chemical Company v. Loveless et al

Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Defendant: Allen Loveless and KDL Farms
Case Number: 2:2007cv00043
Filed: April 4, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Dismiss garnishee Griffin Grain. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/24/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 91 Motion to Dismiss Bunge Corporation as Garnishee without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/23/09. (bkp)
February 17, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Scoular Company is dismissed as Garnishee and released from any and all liability and obligations imposed by the writ of garnishment served upon it. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/17/09. (mkf)
November 19, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 61 Motion for Leave of Court for voluntary non-suit, and directing plaintiff to file its motions for attorney's fees and costs within ten calendar days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Chemical Company v. Loveless et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Loveless
Represented By: Charles P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KDL Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Chemical Company
Represented By: Roger D. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?