Williams v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Eric A Williams
Defendant: M Jackson, Andrew, Beard, J Moss, J Harjo, McAllister, Brown and C M Harris
Case Number: 2:2007cv00110
Filed: August 20, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER replacing 140 Order entered on April 27, 2011. The Clerk of the Court is directed to distribute to Chisenhall, Newstrud & Julian P.A., the amount of $1962.00 from the Fund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/9/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to jury verdict in favor of defts Moses Jackson, Jeremy Andrews and Marion Beard. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/24/11. (kpr)
March 14, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion to Strike, as set forth in this Order, and directing the parties to meet in the judge's chambers, Room C459, at 8:45 a.m., March 22, 2011, for final trial preparations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/14/11. (kpr)
March 10, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 98 USCA Opinion, 99 USCA Judgment dismissing deft Billy Parsons from this action, with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/10/11. (kpr)
March 30, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to withdraw previously-filed motion for Sanctions 70 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Harjo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C M Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?