Zajrael v. Harmon et al

Plaintiff: Warith T.A. Zajrael
Defendant: Greg Harmon, Randy Jackson, Valarie Westbrook, Norman L Hodges, Jr and Does
Case Number: 2:2007cv00158
Filed: December 26, 2007
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds from the Reimbursement of Out-of-Pocket Expenses Fund. The Court orders the Clerk of the Court to distribute to Chester H. Lauck, III, the amount of $575.51 from the Fund and to maintain a copy of this Order, together with the application in the Fund File maintained by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/21/11. (kpr)
November 22, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 132 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts dismissing pltf's complaint with prejudice; the relief sought is denied; the Jury Trial scheduled for 12/6/10 is cancelled. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/22/10. (vjt)
November 10, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendant's 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; and Plaintiff's 2 Complaint DISMISSED with prejudice; since this case is set for a jury trial on 12/6/2010, an original and one copy of objections must be received no later than 7 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/10/2010. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zajrael v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warith T.A. Zajrael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valarie Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman L Hodges, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?