Holsombach v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Holsombach
Defendant: Larry Norris, Greg Harmon and James W Bell
Case Number: 2:2008cv00022
Filed: February 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Motion to reopen. Holsombach's attack on the 2009 Judgment is untimely under Rule 59 and Rule 60(b)(1)-(3). And he hasn't shown he's entitled to relief under Rule 60(b)'s other provisions. If Holsombach wants to litigate his current conditions of confinement, then he must file a new lawsuit. The Court directs the Clerk to mail Holsombach a 1983 complaint form and an in forma pauperis application. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/25/2016. (jak)
July 9, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 55 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Holsombach's request for injunctive relief is unrelated to his 2008 case. The Court directs the Clerk to docket Holsombach's new motion as it would a new 1983 prisoner case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2015. (jak)
February 18, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Greg Harmon, James W Bell, Larry Norris against Mark Anthony Holsombach re 52 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/18/09. (bkp)
January 30, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 36 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 1/30/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holsombach v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Holsombach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?