Butler v. Wards et al

Plaintiff: Johnny L Butler
Defendant: Wards, Gonzalez, Jemmott, Gaila and Levin
Case Number: 2:2008cv00033
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, Defts' 44 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Pltf's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to his failure to timely and properly exhaust his administrative remedies; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/09. (vjt)
April 3, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending 44 Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Request for an Evidentiary Hearing on the Issue of Exhaustion, and that Plaintiff's remaining claims be d ismissed, without prejudice, due to his failure to timely and properly exhaust his administrative remedies; and recommending the court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 4/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/3/09. (hph)
October 16, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss; defts DHO Wards, Jemmott, and Moores are dismissed without prejudice, and certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and ordering defts Lt. Wards, Gonzalez, Levin and Gaila to file an Answer within ten days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/16/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Wards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny L Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemmott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?