Whistle v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wade A Whistle
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc and Lance Houghtling
Case Number: 2:2008cv00037
Filed: March 25, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/3/2009. (mkf)
June 1, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part defendants' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing defendant Lance Houghtling from this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/09. (bkp)
May 6, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to defts' motion for summary judgment; granting 24 Motion for Leave to File amended answer; and denying 30 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whistle v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade A Whistle
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Represented By: William McShane Bridgforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Houghtling
Represented By: William McShane Bridgforth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?