Berger v. Bell et al

Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Defendant: Bell, Greg Harmon, Ray Hobbs, Williams, Bryant, Wilson, Glenny, Does, Kelley, Larry Norris and Hall
Case Number: 2:2008cv00057
Filed: April 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to disburse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $161.34 and distribute it to the named applicant in the 138 Notice filed by Russell Berger. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/2/09. (bkp)
September 28, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/28/09. (bkp)
April 14, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 119 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 114 Motion for Order, which the Court construes as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, filed by Russell Berger. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/14/09. (bkp)
February 6, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing the appointment of attorney Herbert T. Wright, Jr. and appointing Michele Simmons Allgood to represent the plaintiff; and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/6/09. (bkp)
January 12, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file the appropriate financial information needed to process his motion to proceed on appeal ifp within fifteen days of the date of this Order and directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff a copy of the inmate trust fund calculation sheet; and to forward a copy of this Order to the Bookkeeper, EARU 91 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/12/09. (bkp)
November 5, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations, 63 and denying plaintiff's motions for order and protective order 40 66 41 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/5/08. (bkp)
September 22, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 45 and granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss filed by Greg Harmon, Wilson, Hall, Ray Hobbs, Bryant, Larry Norris, Williams, Glenny, Bell, Kelley. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/22/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?