Hinds v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Timothy M Hinds
Defendant: Peter Edwards and Larry Norris
Case Number: 2:2008cv00086
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Peter Edwards against Timothy M Hinds re 47 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/16/09. (bkp)
March 4, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 26 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice; and recommending that 41 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/4/09. (hph)
September 26, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing claims against deft Norris without prejudice. Service is appropriate for deft Edwards and the Clerk is directed to prepare a summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the or iginal complaint w/any attachments, a copy of pltf's objections to the Magistrate's proposed recommendations, a copy of the docket sheet, and a summons for deft through Humphries & Lewis Law firm, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/26/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinds v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M Hinds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?