Quinones v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Defendant: T C Outlaw, United States Bureau of Prisons and Department of Justice
Case Number: 2:2008cv00105
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 20 Objections to Report and Recommendations, which the Court deems a motion for reconsideration, for the reasons set forth in the Findings and Recommended Disposition. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/3/09. (bkp)
February 12, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of United States Bureau of Prisons, T C Outlaw against Guillermo Quinones re 13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/12/09. (bkp)
January 28, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 7 Respondent's Motion to Dismiss be granted, and that the case be dismissed, without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/28/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?