Curtis Lumber Company Inc v. Louisiana Pacific Corporation

Plaintiff: Curtis Lumber Company Inc
Defendant: Louisiana Pacific Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv00107
Filed: May 30, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion for Bill of Costs; granting 135 Motion for Attorney Fees. Attorneys' fees and costs are taxed in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant in the amount of $75,202.63 and $3,884.39 respectively. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/27/11. (kpr)
May 10, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Curtis Lumber Company Inc against Louisiana Pacific Corporation re 115 Jury Verdict in the amount of $34,134.61 in rebate payments, $6,177.00 in inventory and $10,000.00 in interest. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/11. (kpr)
June 8, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Louisiana Pacific Corporation against Curtis Lumber Company Inc re 73 Order Dismissing Case; Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/09. (mkf)
May 26, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 28 Motion to Bifurcate; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 33 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 36 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/09. (bkp)
February 27, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Quash and for protective order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/27/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis Lumber Company Inc v. Louisiana Pacific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lumber Company Inc
Represented By: Daniel Warren Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?