Nelson v. Yang et al

Plaintiff: Bryant Nelson
Defendant: Yee Yang and Vickie Moore
Case Number: 2:2008cv00144
Filed: July 21, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, pursuant to 51 Order of Dismissal entered this date, this case is dismissed, without prejudice, due to Plaintiff's failure to timely & properly comply with the Court's 11/6/08 Order. Further, the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Judgment & the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/23/08. (jct)
November 6, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to send petitioner an Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the entry of this order, a statement indicating whether he wishes to continue with this lawsuit and an Amended Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/5/08. (bkp)
October 23, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 30 and denying Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bryant Nelson 34 and certifying that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/23/08. (bkp)
September 2, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction which was construed as a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order ; Adopting 15 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/2/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Yang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yee Yang
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Moore
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?