Batts v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Edward A Batts
Defendant: Larry Norris, Charlotte Green, Greg Harmon and Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv00149
Filed: August 4, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 123 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
February 11, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 63 Partial Report and Recommendations in its entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; the claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice under FRcvP 4(m). Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/11/09. (mkf)
December 12, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to issue summons for Defendants Harmon, Norris, and Austin, and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the Complaint, Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint w/any attachments, and a summons for these Defendants without prepayment of costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 12/12/08. (mkf)
November 7, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/7/08. (mkf)
September 26, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defts Norris, Harmon and Austin, without prejudice, as party defts, and dismissing pltf's claims against defts Green and Kelley in their official capacities, without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/26/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batts v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?