USA v. House et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Jerry L House and Annie J House
Case Number: 2:2008cv00159
Filed: August 15, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1345 Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/14/10. (bkp)
November 12, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT entitling the U.S. A. to judgment in rem in the principal amount of $149,727.75, interest in the amount of $12,369.48, accrued through September 3, 2009 and thereafter at the daily rate of $13.33, to date of this judgment and thereafter at the statutory rate. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/09. (bkp)
November 10, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking the Clerk's Default entered in this case and denying 6 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/10/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Gwendolyn Dewees Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry L House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie J House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?