Nelson v. Cobb

Plaintiff: Bryant Nelson
Defendant: Cobb
Case Number: 2:2008cv00180
Filed: October 7, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 8 Order on Report and Recommendations; this case is DISMISSED without prejudice; the relief sought is denied; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/6/09. (mkf)
January 20, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 5 Report and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; Pltf's Complaint is DISMISSED w/o prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2); the Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from the order dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/09. (mkf)
December 29, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with LR 5.5(c)(2) 1 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/29/2008. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?