Williams v. Lockhart et al

Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Defendant: William Ivory, Douglas Lockhart, Williams, Tameka Cody, Eric Pharr and Kristy Lewis
Case Number: 2:2008cv00182
Filed: October 8, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 69 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case without prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/09. (bkp)
September 18, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' 61 Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED, and pltf's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the Court certify that an ifp appeal from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action be considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/18/09. (vjt)
March 4, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/4/09. (dac)
February 6, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration re 23 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/6/09. (dac)
January 20, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 19 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Sgt. Williams and removing him as a party defendant. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lockhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ivory
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Lockhart
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tameka Cody
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Pharr
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Lewis
Represented By: Hester I. Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?