Winnett v. Edwards et al

Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Defendant: M Williams, LeBelong, Green and Joe Hughes
Case Number: 2:2008cv00199
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against Donald Winnett pursuant to 110 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/09. (bkp)
December 2, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defts LeBelong, M Williams, and Green's motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's complaint against them be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/2/09. (tjj)
April 13, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Dismiss Party Dr. Joe Hughes from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/13/09. (bkp)
January 20, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss deft Dr. Edwards as a party to this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/20/09. (bkp)
December 2, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 5 that plaintiff's food/kitchen claim against deft Bell is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/2/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winnett v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Williams
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeBelong
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Represented By: Ka Tina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Hughes
Represented By: Michelle Banks Odum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?