Mauldin v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Mauldin
Defendant: Tracy W Johns, T C Outlaw and Harley G Lappin
Case Number: 2:2008cv00213
Filed: December 11, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's 43 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered summarily dismissing the 28 U.S.C. § 2241 petition for writ of habeas corpus, without prejudice, for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/14/09. (hph)
February 27, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and referring this matter to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/27/09. (bkp)
February 11, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the District Court dismiss the Complaint without prejudice, under Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to comply with the Court's Order of 12/29/08. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/11/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauldin v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Lee Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy W Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley G Lappin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?