Marks v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Richard E Marks
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2008cv00214
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Timothy C Outlaw against Richard E Marks re 15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/21/09. (bkp)
April 28, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard E Marks be dismissed with prejudice and the relief prayed for denied. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/28/09. (bkp)
February 6, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within 30 days to respondent's argument that the petition should be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/6/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?