Sanders v. Lee County School District No. 1 et al

Plaintiff: Sharon Y Sanders
Defendant: Lee County School District No. 1, Lee County Arkansas Board of Education, Elizabeth Johnson, Milton Hall, Victory Perry and Pearlethe Collins
Case Number: 2:2008cv00219
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached among the parties. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/2/12. (kpr)
March 23, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to confer on the issue to go forward in this action, and if they are in agreement, submit a joint report within 30 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/12. (vjt)
September 27, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees pursuant to 79 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against defts for attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $6,596.85 plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.25% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/10. (vjt)
July 22, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against Lee County Arkansas Board of Education, Lee County School District No. 1, Elizabeth Johnson, Milton Hall, Pearlethe Collins, Victory Perry, jointly and severally, in the amount of $70,825.00 for actual damages; in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against Milton Hall, individually, in the amount of $2,500 for punitive damages; in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against Elizabeth Johnson, individually, in the amount of $5,000 for punitive dam ages; and in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against Victory Perry, individually, in the amount of $500 for punitive damages, plus post-judgment interest to a ccrue at the rate of 0.31% per annum, for all which garnishment and execution may issue re 64 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/22/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 63 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Sharon Y Sanders against defts jointly and severally in the amount of $60,825.00 for actual damages; against Milton Hall individually in the amount of $2,500 for punitive damages; against Elizabeth Johnson individually in the amount of $5,000 for punitive damages; and agaisnt Victory Perry individually in the amount of $500 for punitive damages, plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.31% per annum. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/16/10. (vjt)
July 9, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing John W. Walker, David M. Hargis, Joy Springer and Lawrence "Tony" Walker to bring certain electronic equipment into the Courthouse in Helena, AR between July 12, 2010, and July 16, 2010, subject to the rules set forth herein. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/10. (bkp)
January 22, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; granted as to pltf's hostile work environment claim and denied as to the race discrimination claim; pltf's 43 MOTION to Strike certain arguments in defts' reply brief is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/22/10. (vjt)
December 23, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER, for the reasons stated, GRANTING the Defendants' request that this case be transferred to the Helena Division. The Court orders that the Clerk transfer this case to the Helena Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/23/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Lee County School District No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Y Sanders
Represented By: Michael D. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County School District No. 1
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Arkansas Board of Education
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Johnson
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Hall
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victory Perry
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlethe Collins
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?