Chestang v. Wiggins et al

Plaintiff: KeOndra Montrel Chestang
Defendant: Calvin Wiggins, Steve Outlaw, Greg Harmon, Ray Hobbs and Larry Norris
Case Number: 2:2009cv00068
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to issue a check to On the Record Reporting & Transcription, Inc. in the amount of $564.20 for the transcript submitted on May 25, 2011 127 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/18/11. (kpr)
July 13, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 129 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of KeOndra Montrel Chestang against Martha Wiggins in the amount of $1.00. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/13/11. (vjt)
April 11, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Dept of Correction to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff, inmates Jamie Dale Bryant (ADC #127178) and Otis Arnold (ADC #098272), deft Wiggins, and Warden Greg Harmon at the April 28, 2011 Hearing, together with a copy of plaintiff's medical records and institutional file. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7023 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/11. (kpr)
February 28, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft to file a response to pltf's 87 Motion for Order of Transfer, 91 Motion for Jury Trial, 92 Motion for Copy of Deposition, and 99 Motion for Order to Subpoena, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/28/11. (vjt)
February 23, 2011 102 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER declining to adopt 96 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; denying 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by deft Martha Wiggins; CASE IS REFERRED BACK to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/23/11. (vjt)
August 2, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 77 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)
June 14, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/14/10. (vjt)
July 23, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts with the summons, complaint and amended complaint without prepayment of fees therefor in care of the ADC Compliance Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestang v. Wiggins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeOndra Montrel Chestang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?