Kemmer et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: Roy Kemmer, Leta Kemmer, Sherry L Kemmer, Sheila L Kemmer, Kenneth Ray Garrison, Mary Jane Garrison, Tracy Scott McCarty, Janette McCarty, W T Altom, Evalee Altom and Thomas Shane Stone
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00073
Filed: June 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 70 Response in Opposition to Motion 54 to Certify Class. The Clerk is directed to substitute exhibit H to the response. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/10. (bkp)
January 6, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/6/10. (bkp)
December 14, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/14/09. (bkp)
December 3, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 31 Motions to Consolidate Cases and Notice of Related Case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/3/09. (bkp) (docket text modified on 12/4/2009 to include ruling on 31 motion and notice of related case) (bfw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kemmer et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Kemmer
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leta Kemmer
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L Kemmer
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila L Kemmer
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Ray Garrison
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Garrison
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Scott McCarty
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette McCarty
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W T Altom
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evalee Altom
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Shane Stone
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?