Pickens v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Michael Glenn Pickens
Defendant: Moses Jackson, Beard, Dover, Ray Hobbs, Andrews and Harmon
Case Number: 2:2009cv00081
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2012 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 296 Motion for Reimbursement of Out-Of-Pocket Expenses, the Clerk is directed to disperse money from the Library Fund in the amount of $4,819.92 and distribute it to the named applicant. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/12. (vjt)
September 7, 2012 295 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 292 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Jeremy Andrews, Marion Beard, and Moses Jackson dismissing the complaint of Michael Glenn Pickens with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/7/12. (vjt)
September 4, 2012 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING 287 ORDER, re transport of Eric W. Williams; Mr. Williams will not be called as a witness. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/4/12. (vjt)
August 23, 2012 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of pltf Michael Glenn Pickens, ADC #91738, along with his complete institutional and medical files, at the Jury Trial on 9/4/12 in Little Rock. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/23/12. (vjt)
August 8, 2012 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to return pltf's letter and attachments to him (enclosed) without filing them. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/8/12. (vjt)
August 3, 2012 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 255 Motion for Expenses; the Clerk is authorized to issue a check from the Library Fund in the amount of $99.87 to the law firm of Lyons & Cone, PLC; re pltf's request for advance approval for the retention of expert Jim Rhiner, the Court gives advance approval of fees and expenses not to exceed $3,762.50, on the condition that Rhiner testify by videoconference. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/3/12. (vjt)
June 27, 2012 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 252 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, defts' 248 motion for reconsideration is denied, and the Court's Order is clarified to make clear that defts are not entitled to qualified immunity because there are genuine material factual disputes for a jury to decide. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/27/12. (vjt)
April 26, 2012 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 243 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims against defts Leslie Dover, Ray Hobbs, Greg Harmon, and Wendy Kelley are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/26/12. (kpr)
August 6, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 125 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 107 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Deft Tracy Aldridge is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/6/10. (vjt)
June 4, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 79 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 62 Motion for TRO filed by Michael Glenn Pickens. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/4/10. (bkp)
March 19, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/19/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickens v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Glenn Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?