Bell v. Ramesy et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Bell
Defendant: D Ramesy, Greg Harmon and P Hill
Case Number: 2:2009cv00084
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 61 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing the case without prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/15/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defts.: Plaintiff is directed to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that 22 MOTION for Discovery filed by Daniel Bell be re-docketed as a request for discovery from the defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
October 8, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; defendant P. Hill is DISMISSED from plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/8/09. (mkf)
August 11, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint and amended complaint on defts D. Ramesy and Greg Harmon in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Ramesy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Ramesy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?