Williams v. Whitfield et al

Plaintiff: Al M Williams
Defendant: Lonnie Whitfield, John Doe, Bell, Ruben and Shelia Scaife
Case Number: 2:2009cv00100
Filed: July 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 450 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT 449 in favor of Helena Regional Medical Center dismissing the complaint of Al M Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/27/13. (vjt)
November 17, 2010 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 359 Partial Report and Recommendations; therefore, the Motions for Summary Judgment 288 300 310 , and the Motion to Dismiss 269 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/17/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltf's 363 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Partial Recommended Disposition; Objections to R&R due 11/12/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/10. (vjt)
August 23, 2010 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 353 Motion for Reconsideration of 351 Order denying his Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/23/10. (vjt)
July 6, 2010 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 315 Motion for Reconsideration of 302 Order Denying Motion to Appoint Expert. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/6/10. (vjt)
July 2, 2010 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 276 & 279 OF Magistrate Judge Beth Deere as this Court's findings in all respects. Accordingly, 232 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED, & 151 Motion to Dismiss filed by Phillips Hospital Corporation, d/b/a Helena Regional Medical Center, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/2/2010. (jct)
June 8, 2010 271 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 266 Motion to Vacate ; denying 267 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/8/10. (bkp)
June 2, 2010 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 225 Partial Report and Recommendation in its entirety; therefore, pltf's 204 Motion to Amend is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/2/10. (vjt)
May 7, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 180 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Ball, Dhallek, Phillips County, and Webber are DISMISSED without prejudice; Phillips County, David Webber, Don Ball and Dhallek terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/7/10. (vjt)
May 3, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 178 Motion to Compel; denying 195 Motion to Compel; denying 203 Motion for Order for Subpoenas; granting 205 Motion to Compel; granting 207 Motion for Reconsideration re 199 Order on Motion for Copies of Local Rules. Clerk is directed to forward Mr Williams a copy of the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/3/10. (dac)
April 19, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 189 Motion for Reconsideration re 174 Order; granting 190 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/6/10 to File Response re 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting 191 Motion for Copies. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide Plaintiff copies of docket entries #151, #152, and #175. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/19/10. (dac)
April 8, 2010 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 Motion to Amend. Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiffs motion to amend (#106) as his Amended Complaint adding Don Ball, Dhallek, Phillips County, Ed Williams, Sheriff, and David Webber as party Defendants. denying [1 56] Motion to Compel; denying as moot 158 Motion to Amend; denying 163 Motion to Compel; denying 164 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 168 Motion to Appoint Expert. Plaintiff is hereby notified of his opportunity to file a response opposing the 151 motion for summary judgment within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/8/10. (dac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Whitfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Scaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?