Hernandez v. Outlaw et al

Plaintiff: Gerardo Hernandez
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw, Valeerie E Jimmerson, Willie Mae Cherry and Jason A Sickler
Case Number: 2:2009cv00134
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/16/11. (hph)
May 4, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Plaintiff is directed to file a response to the motion within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/4/11. (kpr)
December 20, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft to file a response to pltf's 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/20/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Report and Recommendations and directing the plaintiff to file a response to deft's motion to dismiss within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/10. (bkp)
April 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Gerardo Hernandez; directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on the U.S. Attorney for this district and the U.S. Attorney General without prepayment of fees therefor; and dismissing from this case without prejudice defts Outlaw, Jimmerson, Cherry and Sickler. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/7/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion for reconsideration 8 and denying the motion for leave to appeal ifp 10 ; reopening case; ordering plaintiff to amend his complaint as required by the September 18, 2009 order within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Outlaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeerie E Jimmerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Mae Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason A Sickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?