Pepper v. Clinkscale et al

Plaintiff: Greg Pepper
Defendant: Clinkscale, Harris, Ramsey and Jackson
Case Number: 2:2009cv00143
Filed: September 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 60 Order entered today, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, due to Plaintiff's failure to timely and properly comply with the Court's 3/31/2011 Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/4/2011. (dmn)
April 19, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, the John Doe Defendants and Pltf's inadequate medical care claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; John Doe terminated; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/19/10. (vjt)
September 24, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to take the necessary steps to transfer the case to the docket of Judge Susan W. Wright, with referral to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray, and to make the necessary chip exchange. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepper v. Clinkscale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Pepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinkscale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?