Foster et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: Winston P Foster, Jr, Mary Ned Foster and Mary Frances Gaston
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 2:2009cv00147
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 51 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding prejudgment interest to Winston and Mary Ned Foster in the amount of $165,030.77 and to Mary Frances Gaston in the amount of $28,947.60; attorneys' fees are awarded in the amount of $37,708.30; and costs are awarded in the amount of $710.91. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/2/11. (kpr)
November 9, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 motion and supplemental motion 55 to stay. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/9/10. (bkp)
October 13, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Mary Ned Foster, Winston P Foster, Jr against David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc in the amount of $652,755, plus postjudgment interest of.26% per annum until paid; and in favor of Mary Frances Gaston against David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc the amount of $114,498, plus postjudgment interest of.26% per annum until paid 46 Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/10. (bkp)
September 8, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 42 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/8/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/2/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston P Foster, Jr
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ned Foster
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Frances Gaston
Represented By: Richard Christopher Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?