Tucker v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Richard Scott Tucker
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc, Wendy Kelley, Charlotte Green, Robert Plant, Debra West, Teresa Kundert, Michael Phieffer and Does
Case Number: 2:2009cv00151
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 393 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Tucker's complaint and amended complaints, Document Nos. 2, 29, 78, 79 &303, are dismissed without prejudice as to all Defendants except John Lytle. All claims against Lytle are dismissed with prejudice. This dismissal counts as a &qu ot;strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (g). The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3).. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/22/11. (hph)
August 30, 2010 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 238 Magistrate Judge Young's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; granting 204 Dr John Lytle's Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing 79 the time barred complaint against him with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/10. (hph)
August 9, 2010 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 196 Magistrate Judge Young's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; and denying 173 Tucker's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/9/10. (hph)
August 5, 2010 278 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, amended complaints (de#s 2,3,29,78,79,143 & 157), this Order, and summons upon defts Theodore Duensing and Michael Pfeiffer without prepayment of fees or costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 8/5/10. (bkp)
August 4, 2010 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 193 Magistrate Judge Young's Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Dispsition; and denying 170 Tucker's Motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injuctive relief. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/4/10. (hph)
May 5, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to add Dr. Theodore Duensing (originally sued as John Doe) and nurse Dianna Locklear (originally sued as Jane Doe) as defts in this matter; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 3 29 78 79 143 157 , and this Order on these defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/5/10. (vjt)
April 20, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 102 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 88 Motion for Protective Order filed by Richard Scott Tucker. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/20/10. (bkp)
March 15, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 81 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 37 Motion for TRO filed by Richard Scott Tucker. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/15/10. (bkp)
March 5, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft John O. Lytle and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, brief in support, amended complaints, this order, and summons on Lytle at the address provided by plaintiff without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/5/10. (bkp)
January 22, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion to Compel a ruling on his motion for injunctive relief; granting 89 Motion for Copies and directing the clerk to send Tucker copies of defs' responses (docket entries 68 and 69) to his motion for injunctive relief, a long with a copy of the brief in support filed by defts CMS, Inc. and Charlotte Green (docket entry #70); granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 81 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Replies due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/22/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Correctional Medical Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Kundert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Phieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?