Marlin v. Marquez et al

Plaintiff: Michael D Marlin
Defendant: Richie Marquez and Greg Thompson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00009
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER partially adopting Magistrate Judge Kearney's proposed findings and recommended disposition; and revoking his Marlin's in forma pauperis status and dismissing 2 his Complaint without prejudice under 28 U.S.C.A. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/10. (hph)
May 25, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to 16 MOTION to Dismiss , Or In The Alternative, Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Greg Thompson, Richie Marquez within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/25/10. (bkp) Modified on 5/25/2010 to correct typographical error (bkp).
February 18, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion to Waive Filing Fees; and directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Richie Marquez and Greg Thompson and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint an d summons on the defts., the U.S. Attorney, Eastern District of Arkansas, and the U.S. Attorney General, without prepayment of costs therefor; and further directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden, Beaumont Low Federal Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 26020, Beaumont, TX 77720. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/18/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlin v. Marquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Marlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richie Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?