Conway v. Correctional Medical Services et al

Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Wendy Kelly, Sharon King, Zonnie M Jones and A Jones-Granger
Case Number: 2:2010cv00010
Filed: January 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 164 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 163 Order dismissing case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/26/11. (kpr)
September 14, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/14/11. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure the presence of Byron L. Conway, ADC #113285, at the Pre-Jury Evidentiary Hearing scheduled at 9:30 a.m., August 11, 2011, at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 600 We st Capitol Avenue, Courtroom 4B, Little Rock, AR, together with a copy of plaintiff's medical records. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/28/11. (kpr)
January 7, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 139 motion to voluntarily dismiss deft Brenda Bearden and dismissing deft Bearden from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/7/11. (bkp)
November 1, 2010 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 111 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Wendy Kelly is construed as a cross-motion for summary judgment and directing the Clerk to amend the docket entry to reflect this change. Pltf shall file a response to deft's cross-motion for summary judgment within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/10. (bkp)
September 20, 2010 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 116 Motion to Compel and Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/20/10. (bkp)
August 17, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 81 Motion to Strike ; granting 103 Motion to Stay ; directing defts CMS, Inc. and the other medical defts to respond to plaintiff's motions to compel and for sanctions within 10 days of the date of this Order; and directing deft Kelley to respond to pltf's counter-motion for summary judgment within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/17/10. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 65 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Wendy Kelly directing plaintiff to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Jerre Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/16/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
June 7, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Clarify; granting 35 37 Motion to Take Depositions from Byron L. Conway, ADC #113285. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/7/10; and directing the Clerk to issue summons on Zonnie (Jones) Burnell and to reissue the summons and service on defts Jerry Douglas and Nicole (Stacy) Granger and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons on these defts without fees and costs therefor (bkp)
May 10, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk not to reissue summons until the plaintiff clarifies which deft should be served; and directing the plaintiff to respond to this Order within 10 days of the date of this Order 28 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/10/10. (bkp)
March 31, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, original and amended complaints on deft Kelley in care of the Compliance Division-ADC, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550; and upon defts CMS, Inc., Sharon King, Zonnie Jones, A Jones-Granger, Stacy Granger, Kathleen Maples, Jerry Douglas, Dottie Yarbrough and Brenda Bearden in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/31/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. Correctional Medical Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron L Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zonnie M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Jones-Granger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?