Borum v. Taylor et al

Plaintiff: Anthony A Borum
Defendant: Ella Taylor, Manning, Vicki Moore, A Thomas and Greg Harmon
Case Number: 2:2010cv00017
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 116 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; and dismissing Plaintiff Anthony Borum's complaint, with prejudice, with respect to his claims against defendant Ella Taylor, and dismissing without prejudice in all other respects. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/29/2013. (kdr)
October 13, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge H. David Young's proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; dismissing Plaintiff's claims against defendant Anthony Thomas without prejudice; denying 68 defendants Ella Taylor, Ruby Jones-Mannin g, and Vicki Moore's motion to dismiss; granting Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss his claims against Greg Harmon; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Harmon; granting Plaintiff's motion to withdraw h is amended complaint; dismissing the amended complaint with prejudice and removing the names of Correctional Medical Services, Inc. and Chiquita Davis as party Defendants; and denying as moot 73 Harmon's motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/11. (hph)
September 13, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to 68 Motion to Dismiss and 73 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/13/11. (vjt)
May 24, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct names of defts Anthony Thomas (originally sued as A Thomas), Vickie Moore (originally sued as Vicki Moore), and Ruby Jones-Manning (originally sued as Manning); the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on these defts (ADDRESSES UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/24/11. (vjt)
April 4, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for the ADC's medical contractor to provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the last known address of defts Thomas, Moore, and Manning, to be filed under seal, or to state these defts have not been employees of the contractor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/4/11. (vjt)
July 6, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on deft Ella Taylor, at the address provided by pltf 29 , without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/6/10. (vjt)
April 2, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on Deft Ella Taylor at last known address which is to remain under seal, and on Defts A. Thomas, Vicki Moore, and Manning in care of counsel for the ADC's medical provider, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/2/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borum v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony A Borum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ella Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?