Sohn v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Randy Keith Sohn
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00029
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 20 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/16/12. (kpr)
March 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Request filed by Randy Keith Sohn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/14/11. (kpr)
April 1, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the United States Attorney by regular mail; and directing respondent to file a response within 20 days after service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. on 4/1/10. (bkp) (Docket entry modified on 4/2/2010 to correct the signer.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sohn v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Keith Sohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?