Robason v. Thomas et al

Plaintiff: Gene Austin Robason
Defendant: Michael Thomas, John Doe and Helena-West Helena, Arkansas
Case Number: 2:2010cv00037
Filed: March 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 66 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Michael Thomas dismissing the complaint of Gene Austin Robason with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/18/11. (vjt) (Docket entry modified on 10/19/2011 to correct the file date.) (thd).
October 13, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part defts' 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; defts' 57 Motion in Limine is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/13/11. (vjt)
September 27, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 49 Motions for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Disclosure Sheets; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/30/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/11. (vjt)
February 18, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 22 Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions; Motions due by 3/3/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/18/11. (vjt)
January 18, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 14 Motion to Extend Deadlines; Discovery due by 2/3/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/18/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robason v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Austin Robason
Represented By: Robert A. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena-West Helena, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?